This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 12:14:17 (UTC).

RIVERA, ABRAHAM VS GARCIA, TERAH ROSE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 RIVERA, ABRAHAM filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GARCIA, TERAH ROSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COHEN, LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6482

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COHEN, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RIVERA ABRAHAM

Respondent

GARCIA TERAH ROSE

 

Court Documents

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

1/4/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Minute Order

1/4/2021: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

1/4/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Proof of Service - TRO personally served 12/15

12/23/2020: Proof of Service - TRO personally served 12/15

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

12/14/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/14/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

11/25/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

11/25/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

11/25/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

11/25/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Minute Order

12/14/2020: Minute Order

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

11/25/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (TRO personally served 12/15 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 94; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less