This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 15:55:58 (UTC).

RITA AIJALA VS CERTIFIED AUTO COLLISION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 RITA AIJALA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CERTIFIED AUTO COLLISION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7841

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AIJALA RITA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF LANCASTER

CERTIFIED AUTO COLLISION

Cross Defendant and Defendant

CERTIFIED AUTO COLLISION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HABBAS SAMER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

RAMSEY CHRISTOPHER PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/19/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

5/7/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/6/2021: Answer

Motion to Transfer

6/4/2021: Motion to Transfer

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF RITA AIJALA'S NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CITY OF LANCASTER'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF ACTION

9/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF RITA AIJALA'S NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CITY OF LANCASTER'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF ACTION

Motion to Transfer

9/21/2021: Motion to Transfer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (THE CITY OF LANCASTER'S MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION FROM T...)

9/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (THE CITY OF LANCASTER'S MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION FROM T...)

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF ACTION

10/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF ACTION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • Hearing08/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • Hearing08/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 1 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Transfer of Action); Filed by Rita Aijala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion for Transfer of Action to Antelope Valley Courthouse) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMotion to Transfer (Action from the Central District to the North District); Filed by City of Lancaster (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (The City of Lancaster's Motion to Transfer this Action from t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketOpposition (Plaintiff Rita Aijala's Non-Opposition to Defendant City of Lancaster's Motion for Transfer of Action); Filed by Rita Aijala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketMotion to Transfer (the Case from the Central District to the North District); Filed by City of Lancaster (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by City of Lancaster (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Lancaster (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rita Aijala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rita Aijala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rita Aijala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rita Aijala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rita Aijala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 21STCV07841 Hearing Date: September 21, 2021 Dept: 28

This motion is denied without prejudice. It needs to be brought in Dept. 1. '

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LANCASTER is a litigant