This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 03:26:57 (UTC).

RIOS, GERALDINE A. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 RIOS, GERALDINE A - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4122

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ZAPATA PENELOPE ANN

Decedent

RIOS GERALDINE A.

Not Classified By Court

FINCH MARY A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

AARONS VILMA M

FELDMAN STEPHEN MARK

 

Court Documents

Receipt - Receipt For Distribution of Fees and Cost-Stephen M. Feldman, Esq.

12/9/2021: Receipt - Receipt For Distribution of Fees and Cost-Stephen M. Feldman, Esq.

Receipt - Receipt For Distribution of Fees and Costs-JuliusAarons, Esq.

12/9/2021: Receipt - Receipt For Distribution of Fees and Costs-JuliusAarons, Esq.

Order - Final Distribution - Order Directing Final Distribution and Allowing Compensation

11/18/2021: Order - Final Distribution - Order Directing Final Distribution and Allowing Compensation

Declaration - Declaration of Julius Aarons Re Authority and Right to Allocated Statutory Fee

9/24/2021: Declaration - Declaration of Julius Aarons Re Authority and Right to Allocated Statutory Fee

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

9/27/2021: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Affidavit - Affidavit re 13100

9/27/2021: Affidavit - Affidavit re 13100

Declaration - Of Stephen M. Feldman to Clear Probate Notes

9/20/2021: Declaration - Of Stephen M. Feldman to Clear Probate Notes

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

9/20/2021: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Declaration - Of Penelope Ann Zapata to Clear Probate Notes

9/20/2021: Declaration - Of Penelope Ann Zapata to Clear Probate Notes

Minute Order

9/24/2021: Minute Order

Inventory & Appraisal - Final

3/22/2021: Inventory & Appraisal - Final

Account - Final or Waiver - First And Final Account And Report, Final Distribution.

5/6/2021: Account - Final or Waiver - First And Final Account And Report, Final Distribution.

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing On Petition for Settlement of First and Final Account and Petition for Final Distribution; Order Fixing and Allowing Compensation for All Services Rendered

5/7/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing On Petition for Settlement of First and Final Account and Petition for Final Distribution; Order Fixing and Allowing Compensation for All Services Rendered

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

12/8/2020: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Substitution of Attorney

12/8/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Order - Probate

12/10/2020: Order - Probate

Letters (Initial)

12/24/2020: Letters (Initial)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketReceipt (Receipt For Distribution of Fees and Cost-Stephen M. Feldman, Esq. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketReceipt (Receipt For Distribution of Fees and Costs-JuliusAarons, Esq. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketOrder - Final Distribution (Order Directing Final Distribution and Allowing Compensation )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit re 13100 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Julius Aarons Re Authority and Right to Allocated Statutory Fee ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition (Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Admin. W/General Powers ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AARONS VILMA M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELDMAN STEPHEN MARK