This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 06:46:09 (UTC).

RIMONE HODGES VS CHRISTOPHER NEWBILL

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 RIMONE HODGES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER NEWBILL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0668

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HODGES RIMONE

Defendant

NEWBILL CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL TIMOTHY PAUL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/27/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/24/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/24/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/24/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/24/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

6/24/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service - No Service

7/19/2022: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/22/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/7/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

11/9/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2024
  • Hearing06/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2023
  • Hearing12/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2023
  • Hearing12/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNotice Plaintiff's Notice of Unavailability of Counsel; Filed by: Rimone Hodges (Plaintiff); As to: Rimone Hodges (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Rimone Hodges (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher Newbill (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Christopher Newbill; On the Complaint filed by Rimone Hodges on 06/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rimone Hodges (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher Newbill (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/19/2022; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Rimone Hodges (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher Newbill (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Rimone Hodges (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rimone Hodges (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher Newbill (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rimone Hodges (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher Newbill (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rimone Hodges (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher Newbill (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL TIMOTHY PAUL