Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 05:40:06 (UTC).

RIMOND ASADORYAN KHOIGANI, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS PREMIER AUTO BODY & REPAIR, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 RIMOND ASADORYAN KHOIGANI, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PREMIER AUTO BODY REPAIR, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1622

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TOROSIAN AN INDIVIDUAL ADE

ASADORYAN KHOIGANI AN INDIVIDUAL RIMOND

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TER-ALEKSANYAN AN INDIVIDUAL ZHORZH

RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL HAMLET

PREMIER AUTO BODY & REPAIR A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YARIAN LEVIK

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MGDESYAN ESQ. GEORGE G.

BOYADZHYAN ARAKSYA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARINGS FOR: CMC, OSC RE MSC, FSC, AND TRIAL

9/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARINGS FOR: CMC, OSC RE MSC, FSC, AND TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER

8/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

8/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/17/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/17/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

4/6/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Cross-Complaint

3/20/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

3/23/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

1/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/23/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/24/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • Hearing08/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Hearing07/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Hearing05/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Status Conference (reMediation and Discovery) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: Mediation and Discovery)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Status Conference (reMediation and Discovery) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: Mediation and Discovery)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF HEARINGS FOR: CMC, OSC re MSC, FSC, and TRIAL); Filed by Rimond Asadoryan Khoigani, an Individual (Plaintiff); Ade Torosian, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF COURT'S MINUTE ORDER); Filed by Rimond Asadoryan Khoigani, an Individual (Plaintiff); Ade Torosian, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rimond Asadoryan Khoigani, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rimond Asadoryan Khoigani, an Individual (Plaintiff); Ade Torosian, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rimond Asadoryan Khoigani, an Individual (Plaintiff); Ade Torosian, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rimond Asadoryan Khoigani, an Individual (Plaintiff); Ade Torosian, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rimond Asadoryan Khoigani, an Individual (Plaintiff); Ade Torosian, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rimond Asadoryan Khoigani, an Individual (Plaintiff); Ade Torosian, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rimond Asadoryan Khoigani, an Individual (Plaintiff); Ade Torosian, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MGDESYAN GEORGE G. ESQ.