This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 23:32:04 (UTC).

RIMA GHARIBIAN VS CITY OF GLENDALE ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 RIMA GHARIBIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF GLENDALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE, EDWARD B. MORETON and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3157

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GHARIBIAN RIMA

Respondents and Defendants

VERDUGO VALLEY SKILLED NURSING AND

DOES 1 TO 25

GLENDALE CITY OF

CITY OF GLENDALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KEOSIAN HAROUT GREG ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

PLEISS LARRY THOMAS

MAURER ANN M.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATES

8/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATES

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

9/1/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATES

10/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATES

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/9/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/6/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES

3/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES

Request for Dismissal

12/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/8/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

COMPLAINT

9/25/2018: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/25/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

Demand for Jury Trial -

10/11/2018: Demand for Jury Trial -

Declaration - of Trial Counsel

10/11/2018: Declaration - of Trial Counsel

Other - - Other - First Amended Complaint

11/5/2018: Other - - Other - First Amended Complaint

Answer - Answer to First Amended Complaint

11/15/2018: Answer - Answer to First Amended Complaint

Answer - Answer To First Amended Complaint

11/16/2018: Answer - Answer To First Amended Complaint

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Hearing05/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE); Filed by Rima Gharibian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketOrder (PROPOSED ORDER); Filed by Rima Gharibian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATES); Filed by Rima Gharibian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketAnswer (Verdugo Valley Skilled Nursing and Wellness Centre); Filed by Verdugo Valley Skilled Nursing And (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Verdugo Valley Skilled Nursing And (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Trial Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rima Gharibian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rima Gharibian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERDUGO VALLEY SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE LLC DBA VERDUGO VALLEY SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF GLENDALE A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLEISS LARRY T.