This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 13:13:22 (UTC).

RIGOBERTO IBARRA GINEZ VS DANIEL GALINDO ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 RIGOBERTO IBARRA GINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL GALINDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH, JILL FEENEY, DANIEL M. CROWLEY, MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2203

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

JILL FEENEY

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GINEZ RIGOBERTO IBARRA

Respondents and Defendants

GALINDO DANIEL

HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

NARAYAN ALEX ESQ.

CASE ANTHONY T.

DORDICK GARY A

LAURICELLA JOAN M.

CHESNEY ESQ STEPHEN L

DORDICK GARY ALAN ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

OBERRECHT KIMBERLY S.

OBERRECHT KIMBERLY SUZANNE

OBERRECHT KIMBERLY SUZANNE ESQ.

CASE ANTHONY THOMAS

CASE ANTHONY THOMAS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

11/19/2021: Notice of Ruling

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO AMENDED DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE USE OF DOCUMENTS NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY

11/23/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO AMENDED DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE USE OF DOCUMENTS NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO AMENDED DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BASED ON HEARSAY CONTAINED WITHIN THE MEDICAL RECORDS, OR OTHER REPORTS OR HEARSAY OPINI

11/23/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO AMENDED DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BASED ON HEARSAY CONTAINED WITHIN THE MEDICAL RECORDS, OR OTHER REPORTS OR HEARSAY OPINI

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FROM MENTIONING A SPECIFIC NUMBER OR AMOUNT OF DAMAGES DURING VOIR DIRE; DECLA

11/23/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FROM MENTIONING A SPECIFIC NUMBER OR AMOUNT OF DAMAGES DURING VOIR DIRE; DECLA

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO AMENDED DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF NON-ECONOMIC DAMAGES PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 3333.4

11/23/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO AMENDED DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF NON-ECONOMIC DAMAGES PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 3333.4

Witness List

12/6/2021: Witness List

Exhibit List

12/6/2021: Exhibit List

Statement of the Case

12/6/2021: Statement of the Case

Jury Instructions

12/6/2021: Jury Instructions

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FROM MENTIONING A SPECIFIC NUMBER OR AMOUNT OF DAMAGES DURING VOIR DIRE [NO. 2 OF 5]

11/12/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FROM MENTIONING A SPECIFIC NUMBER OR AMOUNT OF DAMAGES DURING VOIR DIRE [NO. 2 OF 5]

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BASED ON HEARSAY CONTAINED WITHIN THE MEDICAL RECORDS, OR OTHER REPORTS OR HEARSAY OPINIONS OF NON-TESTIFYING/NON-DESIGNATED EXPERTS [NO. 4 OF 5

11/12/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BASED ON HEARSAY CONTAINED WITHIN THE MEDICAL RECORDS, OR OTHER REPORTS OR HEARSAY OPINIONS OF NON-TESTIFYING/NON-DESIGNATED EXPERTS [NO. 4 OF 5

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDE THE COSTS OF MEDICAL EXAMS INCURRED FOR LITIGATION, NOT TREATMENT [NO. 3 OF 5]

11/12/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDE THE COSTS OF MEDICAL EXAMS INCURRED FOR LITIGATION, NOT TREATMENT [NO. 3 OF 5]

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDE USE OF DOCUMENTS NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY [NO. 1 OF 5]

11/12/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDE USE OF DOCUMENTS NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY [NO. 1 OF 5]

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF NON-ECONOMIC DAMAGES PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 3333.4] [NO. 5 OF 5]

11/12/2021: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF NON-ECONOMIC DAMAGES PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE 3333.4] [NO. 5 OF 5]

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED TRIAL DATES

11/16/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED TRIAL DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL REL...)

11/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL REL...)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/28/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by RIGOBERTO IBARRA GINEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketWitness List; Filed by RIGOBERTO IBARRA GINEZ (Plaintiff); DANIEL GALINDO (Defendant); HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by RIGOBERTO IBARRA GINEZ (Plaintiff); DANIEL GALINDO (Defendant); HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketJury Instructions; Filed by RIGOBERTO IBARRA GINEZ (Plaintiff); DANIEL GALINDO (Defendant); HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by RIGOBERTO IBARRA GINEZ (Plaintiff); DANIEL GALINDO (Defendant); HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOpposition (PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO AMENDED DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BASED ON HEARSAY CONTAINED WITHIN THE MEDICAL RECORDS, OR OTHER REPORTS OR HEARSAY OPINIONS OF NONTESTIFYING NON-DESIGNATED EXPERTS); Filed by RIGOBERTO IBARRA GINEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOpposition (PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FROM MENTIONING A SPECIFIC NUMBER OR AMOUNT OF DAMAGES DURING VOIR DIRE; DECLARATION OF JOHN M. UPTON IN SUPPORT); Filed by RIGOBERTO IBARRA GINEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DANIEL GALINDO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by DANIEL GALINDO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSOCATION OF COUNSEL BEHALF OF DEFENDANT DANIEL GALINDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DANIEL GALINDO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RIGOBERTO IBARRA GINEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2203    Hearing Date: July 20, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

rigoberto ibarra ginez,

Plaintiff,

v.

daniel galindo, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****2203

Hearing Date: July 17, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to bifurcate

Defendants Daniel Galindo and Horizons Construction Company International, Inc. (“Defendants”) move to bifurcate the trial of this case into two phases: liability and damages. Under Code of Civil Procedure section 598, “The court may, when the convenience of witnesses, the ends of justice, or the economy and efficiency of handling the litigation would be promoted thereby . . . make an order . . . that the trial of any issue or any part thereof shall precede the trial of any other issue or any part thereof in the case[.]”  (Code Civ. Proc., ; 598.)

Defendants have not demonstrated that bifurcation would result in efficiencies. Instead, it is likely that it would result in duplication of effort.  Plaintiff Rigoberto Ibarra Ginez (“Plaintiff”) alleges that he was injured in a collision with a vehicle owned and operated by Defendants. It would be logical and efficient for Plaintiff to present evidence on how and why Defendants are liable for the underlying accident at the same time as Plaintiff presents evidence on the resulting injuries. This is particularly true in this case, where the parties disagree on causation of the accident, and the jury might consider the contributory negligence of each side.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendants’ motion to bifurcate the trial is denied. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: July 17, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASE ANTHONY T.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBERRECHT KIMBERLY SUZANNE