Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 06:13:49 (UTC).

RIGOBERTO FLORES PEREZ VS JOSEPH JOEL GORDON, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 RIGOBERTO FLORES PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSEPH JOEL GORDON, JR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5752

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES PEREZ RIGOBERTO

Defendants

GORDON JR. JOSEPH JOEL

J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFMAN MARTIN J.

Defendant Attorney

HSIAO LISA R.

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/19/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

1/4/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/30/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2023
  • Hearing11/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Hearing05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Hearing05/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Joseph Joel Gordon, Jr. (Defendant); J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT, INC., a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by RIGOBERTO FLORES PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by RIGOBERTO FLORES PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RIGOBERTO FLORES PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RIGOBERTO FLORES PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RIGOBERTO FLORES PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAUFMAN MARTIN J.