This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2023 at 15:44:21 (UTC).

RICO'S CUSTOM SHEET METAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS WORLD MECHANICAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 RICO'S CUSTOM SHEET METAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WORLD MECHANICAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1516

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

RICO'S CUSTOM SHEET METAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GORDON HARRY

WORLD MECHANICAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CREDE KENNETH

Cross Defendant Attorney

KLASKIN HAROLD CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER RE: RETENTION OF JURISDICTION OVER THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

10/11/2022: Order - ORDER RE: RETENTION OF JURISDICTION OVER THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

10/5/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 10/05/2022

10/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 10/05/2022

Notice of Settlement

10/5/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER WORLD MECHANICAL'S STIPULATION TO MSC

9/7/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER WORLD MECHANICAL'S STIPULATION TO MSC

Brief - BRIEF NON-CONFIDENTIAL MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

9/7/2022: Brief - BRIEF NON-CONFIDENTIAL MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (RE: MSC IN B)) OF 09/12/2022

9/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (RE: MSC IN B)) OF 09/12/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (RE: MSC IN B))

9/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (RE: MSC IN B))

Brief - BRIEF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF

9/7/2022: Brief - BRIEF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

6/23/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (RE: ADR))

6/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (RE: ADR))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER (RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE))

6/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER (RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER (RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)) OF 06/15/2022

6/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER (RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)) OF 06/15/2022

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HAROLD C. KLASKIN REGARDING CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE

6/8/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HAROLD C. KLASKIN REGARDING CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KENNETH J. CREDE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE

6/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KENNETH J. CREDE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

1/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

10/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order RE: RETENTION OF JURISDICTION OVER THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6: Status Date changed from 10/11/2022 to 10/11/2022; Name Extension changed from [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: RETENTION OF JURISDICTION OVER THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 to RE: RETENTION OF JURISDICTION OVER THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6; Result Date changed from 10/11/2022 to 10/11/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOrder [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: RETENTION OF JURISDICTION OVER THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6; Signed and Filed by: RICO'S CUSTOM SHEET METAL, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: RETENTION OF JURISDICTION OVER THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6: Filed By: RICO'S CUSTOM SHEET METAL, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (*CONDITIONAL*) scheduled for 04/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial (5 day estimate) scheduled for 10/17/2022 at 09:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of 10/05/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: RICO'S CUSTOM SHEET METAL, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Filed to Rejected

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: RICO'S CUSTOM SHEET METAL, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WORLD MECHANICAL, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/30/2020; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RICO'S CUSTOM SHEET METAL, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WORLD MECHANICAL, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); HARRY GORDON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RICO'S CUSTOM SHEET METAL, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WORLD MECHANICAL, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); HARRY GORDON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RICO'S CUSTOM SHEET METAL, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WORLD MECHANICAL, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); HARRY GORDON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RICO'S CUSTOM SHEET METAL, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WORLD MECHANICAL, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); HARRY GORDON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Shirley K. Watkins in Department T Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less