Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 16:31:06 (UTC).

RICOH USA, INC VS DUKE FALCONI, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 RICOH USA, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DUKE FALCONI, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0901

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICOH USA INC

Defendant

FALCONI AN INDIVIDUAL DUKE DBA LITBROS DISCOVERY DTLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GABA RODOLFO

GABA RODOLFO JR.

 

Court Documents

Default Judgment

3/23/2021: Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

3/18/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

3/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

3/23/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...) OF 03/23/2021

3/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...) OF 03/23/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

3/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

2/19/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

2/19/2021: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Proof of Service by Mail

2/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

2/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 01/13/2021

1/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 01/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

1/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/23/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/23/2020: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment/Default Prove-up Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 585) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...) of 03/23/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Ricoh USA, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause); Filed by Ricoh USA, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Ricoh USA, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ricoh USA, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 01/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ricoh USA, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ricoh USA, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ricoh USA, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ricoh USA, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICOH USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO