This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2023 at 10:14:38 (UTC).

RICKY ATKINS VS PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 RICKY ATKINS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4020

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATKINS RICKY

Defendants

PETER KIEWIT SONS' INC.

ALEJANDRO CASIQUE

KIEWIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES NICHELLE DENINE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/17/2020: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/17/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/18/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/4/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

12/28/2020: PI General Order

Request for Dismissal

1/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by RICKY ATKINS on 11/17/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by RICKY ATKINS as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff); As to: PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC. (Defendant); Mailing Date: 11/18/2020; Service Cost: 8.60; Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff); As to: CASIQUE ALEJANDRO (Defendant); Service Date: 11/24/2020; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff); As to: KIEWIT CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 11/18/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff); As to: KIEWIT CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff); As to: PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC. (Defendant); CASIQUE ALEJANDRO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff); As to: PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC. (Defendant); CASIQUE ALEJANDRO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff); As to: PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC. (Defendant); CASIQUE ALEJANDRO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff); As to: PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC. (Defendant); CASIQUE ALEJANDRO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less