This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2021 at 19:05:54 (UTC).

RICKY ATKINS VS PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 RICKY ATKINS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4020

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATKINS RICKY

Defendants

PETER KIEWIT SONS' INC.

ALEJANDRO CASIQUE

KIEWIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES NICHELLE DENINE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/17/2020: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/17/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/18/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/4/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

12/28/2020: PI General Order

Request for Dismissal

1/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RICKY ATKINS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PETER KIEWIT SONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KIEWIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES NICHELLE DENINE