This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 04:55:35 (UTC).

RICKY ALLEN SEARS VS JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/24/2017 RICKY ALLEN SEARS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3682

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEARS RICKY ALLEN

Defendants

SAENZ RIGOBERTO

ZUNIGA JORGE ARMANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KOTTLER DOUGLAS E. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

MANDELL BARBARA J. ESQ.

GETTY WILLIAM CHARLES

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/24/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

8/24/2017: SUMMONS

DEFENDANT JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/11/2017: DEFENDANT JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF RICKY SEARS' COMPLAINT

12/11/2017: JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF RICKY SEARS' COMPLAINT

Substitution of Attorney

5/8/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/7/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Association of Attorney

5/3/2019: Association of Attorney

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

11/6/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

NOTICE OF STAY

3/22/2018: NOTICE OF STAY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF STAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by RICKY ALLEN SEARS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by JORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketJORGE ARMANDO ZUNIGA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF RICKY SEARS' COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RICKY ALLEN SEARS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3682    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Douglas E. Kottler seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for plaintiff Ricky Allen Sears on the grounds that Plaintiff is now deceased and his successor-in-interest will not proceed with the action. Beverly Joyce Burwell is Plaintiff’s successor-in-interest. Kim Earnest holds the power of attorney for Ms. Burwell, including the power to conduct legal matters on Ms. Burwell’s behalf. Ms. Earnest has communicated that she will not proceed with the matter on her mother’s behalf. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.) Counsel’s Motion complies with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362.

No trial date is set in this matter. An OSC re Dismissal for Failure to Appoint a Successor in Interest is set for December 18, 2019. Accordingly, this unopposed motion to be relieved is GRANTED and effective after December 18, 2019 and upon filing a proof of service showing service of this Order on Plaintiff’s successor-in-interest and all parties who have appeared.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOTTLER DOUGLAS E. ESQ.