This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2023 at 11:50:10 (UTC).

RICKEY WAYNE FRANKLIN VS DELORES ANN PRINCE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 RICKEY WAYNE FRANKLIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DELORES ANN PRINCE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0866

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANKLIN RICKEY WAYNE

Claimant

AVALON SUBROGATION PARTNERS LLC AS THE SUBROGATION ADMINISTRATOR FOR UNITED WISCONSIN INSURANCE AND ITS THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR NEXT LEVEL ADMINISTRATORS AND INSURER FOR HR SERVICES GROUP LLC/EDS SERVICE SOLUTIONS LLC

Defendants

ABM INDUSTRIES INCORPORATED

PRINCE DELORES ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BISH MINDY S.

CRUZ RAQUEL

Claimant Attorney

LEMOINE JESSICA

Defendant Attorney

BUCHHOLZ SCOTT D.

 

Court Documents

Association of Attorney

6/23/2023: Association of Attorney

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/21/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Proof of Service by Mail

9/19/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/3/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/1/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/1/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

8/6/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

8/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/6/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

8/6/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) DECLARATION OF SERVICE

8/17/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) DECLARATION OF SERVICE

Answer

8/17/2021: Answer

Notice of Lien - NOTICE OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION SUBROGATION LIEN CLAIM

7/30/2021: Notice of Lien - NOTICE OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION SUBROGATION LIEN CLAIM

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/17/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

7/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2024
  • Hearing05/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • Hearing09/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Rickey Wayne Franklin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Delores Ann Prince (Defendant); ABM Industries Incorporated (Defendant); As to: Rickey Wayne Franklin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 09/21/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/09/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Delores Ann Prince (Defendant); ABM Industries Incorporated (Defendant); As to: Rickey Wayne Franklin (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Rickey Wayne Franklin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rickey Wayne Franklin (Plaintiff); As to: Delores Ann Prince (Defendant); ABM Industries Incorporated (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rickey Wayne Franklin (Plaintiff); As to: Delores Ann Prince (Defendant); ABM Industries Incorporated (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rickey Wayne Franklin (Plaintiff); As to: Delores Ann Prince (Defendant); ABM Industries Incorporated (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less