This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2023 at 08:47:20 (UTC).

RICKERT HENRIKSEN, ET AL. VS SHIMON BEN-SHUSHAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 RICKERT HENRIKSEN, filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against SHIMON BEN-SHUSHAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0738

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HENRIKSEN RICKERT

HENRIKSEN ZHEYLA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BEN-SHUSHAN SHIMON

BEN-SHUSHAN SHLOMIT

SIMON & SIMON CONSTRUCTION INC.

Cross Defendants

1-100 ROES

ASTROM ROOFING CORP

CALIFORNIA HOT MOP

CERTIFIED FIRE PROTECTION INC.

CITY WALL BUILDERS

JEFF ANTHONY MARTIJA DBA POOL LOGIC

KMBJ STRUCTURAL AND WELDING SVCS. INC. DBA KMBJ STRUCTURAL STEEL

LUX NORTH DEVELOPMENT CORP.

M&D DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION INC.

NARVAEZ ALONZO

PROGRESSIVE INSULATION & WINDOWS

ROMANO ART CABINETRY

SERVICE AIR CONDITIONING INC.

WEST COAST DECK WATERPROOFING

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAILEY TERRY ROBERT

HARUTUNIAN MICHAEL

TREYZON BORIS

Defendant Attorney

ZECH JEFFREY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/27/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/27/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

12/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/14/2022: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

10/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Case Management Statement

10/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/15/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

7/15/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Continuance

6/20/2022: Notice of Continuance

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/18/2022: Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2023
  • Hearing12/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2023
  • Hearing12/04/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • Hearing09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SHIMON BEN-SHUSHAN (Defendant); As to: RICKERT HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); ZHEYLA HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/23/2022; Service Cost: 320.44; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SHIMON BEN-SHUSHAN (Cross-Complainant); As to: City Wall Builders (Cross-Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/20/2022; Service Cost: 185.44; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SHIMON BEN-SHUSHAN (Cross-Complainant); As to: Progressive Insulation & Windows (Cross-Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/20/2022; Service Cost: 185.44; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SHLOMIT BEN-SHUSHAN (Cross-Complainant); As to: M&D Development & Construction, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Service Date: 12/23/2022; Service Cost: 149.65; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SHLOMIT BEN-SHUSHAN (Cross-Complainant); SHIMON BEN-SHUSHAN (Cross-Complainant); SIMON & SIMON CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Cross-Complainant); As to: Roes 1-100 (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- California Hot Mop (Cross-Defendant): Organization Name changed from California Hot Mop (ROE 3) to California Hot Mop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint: Exact Name: Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: RICKERT HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); ZHEYLA HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); As to: SHIMON BEN-SHUSHAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/06/2022; Service Cost: 108.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: RICKERT HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); ZHEYLA HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); As to: SIMON & SIMON CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/26/2022; Service Cost: 107.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. H. Jay Ford III in Department O Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RICKERT HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); ZHEYLA HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); As to: SHIMON BEN-SHUSHAN (Defendant); SHLOMIT BEN-SHUSHAN (Defendant); SIMON & SIMON CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RICKERT HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); ZHEYLA HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); As to: SHIMON BEN-SHUSHAN (Defendant); SHLOMIT BEN-SHUSHAN (Defendant); SIMON & SIMON CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RICKERT HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); ZHEYLA HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); As to: SHIMON BEN-SHUSHAN (Defendant); SHLOMIT BEN-SHUSHAN (Defendant); SIMON & SIMON CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RICKERT HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); ZHEYLA HENRIKSEN (Plaintiff); As to: SHIMON BEN-SHUSHAN (Defendant); SHLOMIT BEN-SHUSHAN (Defendant); SIMON & SIMON CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY WALL BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ASTROM ROOFING is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMON & SIMON CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where M&D DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant