This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2021 at 00:17:18 (UTC).

RICK KENNEDY VS WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 RICK KENNEDY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2109

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNEDY RICK

Defendants

FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

FOREST LAWN MORTUARY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CADE NATHANAEL PHILIPPE

Defendant Attorney

QUIGLEY EDWARD F.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

7/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lis Pendens

7/6/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Related Case

7/22/2021: Notice of Related Case

Answer

7/22/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • Hearing09/13/2021 at 2:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION, a California nonprofit corporation (Defendant); FOREST LAWN MORTUARY, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Rick Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rick Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rick Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rick Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rick Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rick Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rick Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEBER ENTERPRISE TRUCKING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FOREST LAWN MORTUARY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL-PARK ASSOCIATION AKA FOREST LAWN MEMORIAL PARK MORTUARY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CADE NATHANAEL PHILIPPE