This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2022 at 16:11:28 (UTC).

RICK HELD VS HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 RICK HELD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4357

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HELD RICK

Defendant

HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EASTON W. DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

10/20/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/25/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2024
  • Hearing09/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • Hearing03/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • Hearing03/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rick Held (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Rick Held (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rick Held (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rick Held (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rick Held (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTON W. DOUGLAS