This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 04:50:46 (UTC).

RICHARD WAYNE SUMMERS VS WB STUDIO ENTERPRISES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2017 RICHARD WAYNE SUMMERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WB STUDIO ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6670

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SUMMERS RICHARD WAYNE

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

WARNDER BROS ENTERTAINMENT INC.

CBS CORPORATION

WB STUDIO ENTERPRISES INC.

WARNER BROS STUDIO FACILITIES

DOES 1 TO 10

CONSORTIUM STUDIOS INC.[DOE 1]

WARNER BROS ENTERTAINMENT INC.

WARNER HORIZON TELEVISION INC.[DOE 2]

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KRISSMAN JOEL ESQ.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HALL ANN C. ESQ.

SMITH KEVIN D. ESQ.

SCHONBUCH MICHAEL

BLANK STACEY F. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

QUIGLEY PATRICK M.

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

3/28/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Other -

10/26/2018: Other -

Request for Dismissal

1/9/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Judicial Notice

2/22/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

2/22/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Ruling

4/2/2019: Notice of Ruling

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/17/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order

4/25/2019: Minute Order

Notice

5/2/2019: Notice

Proof of Personal Service

5/6/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/23/2019: Answer

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/26/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/29/2018: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. IMPLIED INDEMNITY; ETC

1/29/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. IMPLIED INDEMNITY; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

1/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

Unknown

12/27/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

12/12/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/12/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Warner Horizon Television Inc.[Doe 2] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Richard Wayne Summers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on all pending Motions for Summary Judgment); Filed by CBS Corporation (Defendant); Warner Bros Entertainment Inc. (Defendant); Warner Bros Studio Facilities (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Notice (of Court Order re Stipulation to Transfer); Filed by CBS Corporation (Defendant); Warner Bros Entertainment Inc. (Defendant); Warner Bros Studio Facilities (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 09:22 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Transfer Complicated Personal ...) of 04/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order); Filed by CBS Corporation (Defendant); Warner Bros Entertainment Inc. (Defendant); Warner Bros Studio Facilities (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by CBS Corporation (Defendant); Warner Bros Entertainment Inc. (Defendant); Warner Bros Studio Facilities (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Transfer Complicated Personal ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Richard Wayne Summers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Richard Wayne Summers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Richard Wayne Summers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Richard Wayne Summers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC686670    Hearing Date: October 25, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

RICHARD WAYNE SUMMERS ;

Plaintiff,

v.

WB STUDIO ENTERPRISES, INC. , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC686670

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 3 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE MONICA BACHNER presiding in DEPT. 71 of the STANLEY MOSK Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: October 25, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court