This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2019 at 02:14:05 (UTC).

RICHARD W KNIGHT ET AL VS MILLER ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATION ET

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 RICHARD W KNIGHT filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against MILLER ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATION ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY MOHR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1628

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTHONY MOHR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

WOODWARD ARTHUR R.

KNIGHT RICHARD W.

Respondents and Defendants

SMITH LEONARD H. CPA

MILLER ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATION

SMITH LEONARD H.

LHS ACCOUNTANCY CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CHODOS DAVID MANNING ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

RYAN KELLY F. ESQ.

STEWART IAN ANDREW ESQ.

RYAN KELLY FRANCIS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/18/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/1/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PLAINTIFFS' DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/1/2018: PLAINTIFFS' DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order

6/4/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

6/4/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT MILLER ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

6/4/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT MILLER ACCOUNTANCY CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/5/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/5/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/25/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/25/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice

2/28/2019: Notice

Minute Order

3/11/2019: Minute Order

Notice

3/14/2019: Notice

Minute Order

4/3/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

4/5/2019: Notice of Ruling

Declaration

5/1/2019: Declaration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

5/2/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Brief

5/3/2019: Brief

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • Complaint (1st); Filed by Richard W. Knight (Plaintiff); Arthur R. Woodward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by Richard W. Knight (Plaintiff); Arthur R. Woodward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Richard W. Knight (Plaintiff); Arthur R. Woodward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Amended Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting the Filing of First Amended Complaint Against Leonard H Smith CPA and LHS Accountancy Corporation) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Amended Ex Parte Application ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Other - (Rebuttal Memorandum in Support of Motion To Amend; Declaration of David Manning Chodos in Support Thereof Attached Hereto); Filed by Richard W. Knight (Plaintiff); Arthur R. Woodward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Opposition (DEFENDANT SMITH'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO LEA VE TO AMEND; DECLARATION OF JILLIAN M. REYES IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Leonard H. Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • at 10:30 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order Permitting the Filing of First Amended Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting the Filing of First Amended Complaint); Filed by Richard W. Knight (Plaintiff); Arthur R. Woodward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Leonard H. Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DEFENDANT LEONARD H. SMITH, CPA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS RICHARD W. KNIGHT AND ARTHUR R. WOODWARD'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR ACCOUNTING MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Richard W. Knight (Plaintiff); Arthur R. Woodward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691628    Hearing Date: May 14, 2021    Dept: 54

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Richard W. Knight, et. al.,

Plaintiffs,

Case No.:

BC691628

vs.

Tentative Ruling

Miller Accountancy Corporation, et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: May 14, 2021

Department 54, Judge Maurice A. Leiter

Motion for Summary Judgment

Moving Party: Defendants Leonard H. Smith and LHS Accountancy Corp.

Responding Party: Plaintiffs Richard W. Knight and Arthur R. Woodward

T/R: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION IS CONTINUED TO JUNE 18, 2021 AT 9:00 AM.

PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AND SERVE AN OPPOSITION NO LATER THAN MAY 28, 2021.

DEFENDANTS TO FILE AND SERVE A REPLY NO LATER THAN JUNE 11, 2021.

TRIAL IS CONTINUED TO JULY 19, 2021 AT 9:30 AM. THE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE IS CONTINUED TO JULY 9, 2021 AT 9:30 AM.

The Court considers the moving papers and declarations.

Defendants filed and served their motion for summary judgment on February 25, 2021 with hearing set for May 14, 2021. Plaintiffs’ opposition was due on April 29, 2021.

On May 6, 2021, counsel for Plaintiffs, David Manning Chodos, filed a declaration asking the Court to continue the hearing and allow an additional two weeks to file an opposition. Chodos, who is elderly and resides at a senior living facility, declares he was unable to file a timely opposition for medical reasons. (Decl. Chodos ¶ 3.) Chodos states he is on several medications, frequently has been hospitalized and suffers from “chemobrain” which causes exhaustion, memory loss and confusion. (Id.) Chodos filed a similar declaration on July 28, 2020 to explain why Plaintiffs did not file a timely opposition to Defendants’ demurrer. Chodos also stated that medical ailments were to blame for his failure to appear at the March 3, 2021 status conference.

In response, counsel for Defendants, Jillian Reyes, declares that Chodos also said his medical ailments prevented him from making Plaintiffs available for their Court-ordered depositions. (Decl. Reyes ¶ 3(f).) Defendants contend Chodos has been using his medical ailments to improperly delay prosecution of this action.

This case has been pending for more than three years and has a trial date of June 14, 2021. Chodos repeatedly has cited his medical ailments to justify his failure to timely file papers and prosecute this action. As a courtesy, the Court will allow one brief continuance of this motion. The hearing on Defendants’ motion for summary judgment is continued to June 18, 2021 at 9:00 am. Plaintiffs shall file and serve an opposition no later than May 28, 2021. Defendants shall file and serve a reply no later than June 11, 2021. The final status conference and trial dates are continued as set forth above.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHODOS DAVID MANNING ESQ.