This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2022 at 09:08:17 (UTC).

RICHARD THOMPSON VS CITY OF PASADENA

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 RICHARD THOMPSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CITY OF PASADENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LIA MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8717

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LIA MARTIN

 

Party Details

Appellants, Plaintiffs and Respondents

THOMPSON RICHARD

ESNER CHANG & BOYER

CITY OF PASADENA

Appellant, Defendant and Respondent

CITY OF PASADENA

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiffs

ESNER CHANG & BOYER

MILLER LAURIE

LIMON GAYE L.

COOK RONALD L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KENT MICHAEL J.

MCNICHOLAS JOHN PATRICK IV

Defendant Attorneys

DIPIETRO PAUL MICHAEL

HOUSE CALVIN RICHARD

Respondent Attorney

PINCIN EMILY ROSE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Report

10/26/2022: Status Report

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

10/4/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

5/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER FOR MINUTE ORDER DATED 05/05/2022)

5/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER FOR MINUTE ORDER DATED 05/05/2022)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER FOR MINUTE ORDER DATED 05/05/2022) OF 05/13/2022

5/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER FOR MINUTE ORDER DATED 05/05/2022) OF 05/13/2022

Notice of Ruling

5/5/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

5/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

Status Report - STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT BY THE PARTIES

4/29/2022: Status Report - STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT BY THE PARTIES

Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B302316

3/23/2022: Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B302316

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

10/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

Status Report - STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT BY THE PARTIES

10/7/2021: Status Report - STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT BY THE PARTIES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

6/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

Status Report - STATUS REPORT STATUS REPORT BY CITY OF PASADENA

8/7/2020: Status Report - STATUS REPORT STATUS REPORT BY CITY OF PASADENA

Status Report

8/7/2020: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

8/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF APPEAL)

Judgment

8/2/2019: Judgment

171 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • Hearing02/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 11/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/17/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by: City of Pasadena (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Association of Counsel; Filed by: Richard Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Thompson (Plaintiff); City of Pasadena (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 11/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 11/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order for Minute Order Dated 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order for Minute Order Dated 05/05/2022) of 05/13/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
293 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Rita Miller 9:00 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketDocument:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:Conference-Post Mediation Status 07/06/18 at 9:00 am Rita Miller

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketDocument:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketDocument:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Conference-Case Management 01/24/18 at 9:00 am Rita Miller

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other Employment Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less