This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 18:58:57 (UTC).

RICHARD PASTORE VS AUTOZONE WEST, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 RICHARD PASTORE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AUTOZONE WEST, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1261

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASTORE RICHARD

Defendants

AUTOZONE WEST INC.

MUNOZ HUGO

AUTOZONERS LLC

AUTOZONE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESRIANI RODNEY

Defendant Attorneys

PHAN CATHERINE T.

SPADA KRISTEN ELIZABETH

O'BRIEN KRISTEN ELIZABETH

PHAN TIEN T.

Other Attorneys

SHEGERIAN CARNEY RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Disassociation of Attorney - DISASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY OF COUNSEL, KRISTEN SPADA

7/19/2022: Disassociation of Attorney - DISASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY OF COUNSEL, KRISTEN SPADA

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUBMISSION OF JOINT POST-MEDIAT...) OF 07/13/2022

7/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUBMISSION OF JOINT POST-MEDIAT...) OF 07/13/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUBMISSION OF JOINT POST-MEDIAT...)

7/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUBMISSION OF JOINT POST-MEDIAT...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE MED...) OF 07/05/2022

7/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE MED...) OF 07/05/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE MED...)

7/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE MED...)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/6/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Ruling

7/8/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/18/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE OF CMC

5/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CMC

Case Management Statement

6/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/10/2021

6/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/10/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF THOMAS ROUTSON, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF RICHARD PASTORES OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY OR DISMISS THE ACTION

6/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF THOMAS ROUTSON, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF RICHARD PASTORES OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY OR DISMISS THE ACTION

Request - REQUEST PLAINTIFF RICHARD PASTORES REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND TO PRESENT ORAL TESTIMONY ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (C.R.C. 3.1306)

6/17/2021: Request - REQUEST PLAINTIFF RICHARD PASTORES REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND TO PRESENT ORAL TESTIMONY ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (C.R.C. 3.1306)

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PLAINTIFF RICHARD PASTORES NOTICE OF LODGING FEDERAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

6/17/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PLAINTIFF RICHARD PASTORES NOTICE OF LODGING FEDERAL AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF RICHARD PASTORE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY OR DISMISS THE ACTION

6/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF RICHARD PASTORE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY OR DISMISS THE ACTION

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • Hearing01/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • Hearing12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Continuance of the Final Status Conference, Trial, and Discovery Deadline Dates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Additional Time for Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDisassociation of Attorney (of Counsel, Kristen Spada); Filed by Autozone West, LLC Erroneously Sued As Autozone West, Inc. (Defendant); Autozoners, LLC (Defendant); Autozone, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 48, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (reSubmission of Joint Post Mediation Status Report) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUBMISSION OF JOINT POST-MEDIAT...) of 07/13/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUBMISSION OF JOINT POST-MEDIAT...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Autozone West, LLC Erroneously Sued As Autozone West, Inc. (Defendant); Autozoners, LLC (Defendant); Autozone, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF PATRICK JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY COURT PROCEEDINGS); Filed by Autozone West, LLC Erroneously Sued As Autozone West, Inc. (Defendant); Autozoners, LLC (Defendant); Autozone, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF MICHELE WOOD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY COURT PROCEEDINGS); Filed by Autozone West, LLC Erroneously Sued As Autozone West, Inc. (Defendant); Autozoners, LLC (Defendant); Autozone, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Richard Pastore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Richard Pastore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Richard Pastore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Richard Pastore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Richard Pastore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Richard Pastore (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTOZONERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOZONE WEST, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOZONE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R