This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2018 at 05:41:32 (UTC).

RICHARD OCHSMANN PROFESSIONAL VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS CO.

Case Summary

On 10/17/2017 RICHARD OCHSMANN PROFESSIONAL filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8047

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD OCHSMANN PROFESSIONAL

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

SEMPRA ENERGY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEVEN SANDLER

STEVEN SANDLER ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Dismissal - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Ord of Disml without prejudice (SIGNED BY JUDGE MELVIN D. SANDVIG ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - OSC Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Notice-Related Cases ((JCCP 4861) **COMPLEX CASE **NO ACTION TAKEN BY THIS COURT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDLER STEVEN