This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2020 at 11:29:07 (UTC).

RICHARD NORTHAM VS ORGEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 RICHARD NORTHAM filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ORGEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7274

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHAM RICHARD

Defendants

ORGEL

REMCO-REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BENSON ROBERT TRUSTEE FOR SALTMAN FAMILY DECD TRUST AND SLOAN

M AND S TRUST

REMCO-REAL ESTATE MANAGMENT COMPANY INC.

ROBERT BENSON TRUSTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OBIAMIWE NNOGO C.

ONWAEZE OGOCHUKWU VICTOR

Defendant Attorneys

HEATHCOTE TAMARA

REAGAN BARRY JAMES

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/8/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

9/15/2020: Notice of Settlement

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

6/15/2020: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

Association of Attorney

2/27/2020: Association of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

3/18/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF RICHARD NORTHAM AND HIS COUNSEL NNOGO OBIAMIWE ISO PARTIES' STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

3/19/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF RICHARD NORTHAM AND HIS COUNSEL NNOGO OBIAMIWE ISO PARTIES' STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF, RICHARD NORTHAM, AND HIS COUNSEL, NNOGO OBIAMIWE, ISO THE PARTIES' STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL

3/23/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF, RICHARD NORTHAM, AND HIS COUNSEL, NNOGO OBIAMIWE, ISO THE PARTIES' STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE COVID-19 CONTINUANCE)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE COVID-19 CONTINUANCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/10/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/28/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/14/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

7/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER ROBERT BENSON ORGEL, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE SALTMAN FAMILY TRUST DATED MAY 24, 1988 (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS ORGEL, BENSON, TRUSTEE FOR SALTMAN FAMILY DECD TRUST AND SLOAN, M AND S

7/17/2019: Answer - ANSWER ROBERT BENSON ORGEL, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE SALTMAN FAMILY TRUST DATED MAY 24, 1988 (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS ORGEL, BENSON, TRUSTEE FOR SALTMAN FAMILY DECD TRUST AND SLOAN, M AND S

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/11/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/4/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/18/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/12/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Robert Benson Orgel, Trustee for the Saltman Family Trust Dated May 24, 1988 Erroneously Sued As Robert Benson, Trustee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference ((post-COVID-19)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI); Filed by Robert Benson Orgel, Trustee for the Saltman Family Trust Dated May 24, 1988 Erroneously Sued As Robert Benson, Trustee (Defendant); M And S Trust (Defendant); Remco-Real Estate Managment Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Jury Trial ((five-day habitability case)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docketat 3:41 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re COVID-19 Continuance)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Plaintiff, Richard Northam, and his Counsel, Nnogo Obiamiwe, iso the Parties' Stipulation to Continue the Trial); Filed by Orgel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Plaintiff Richard Northam and His Counsel Nnogo Obiamiwe iso Parties' Stipulation to Continue Trial); Filed by Richard Northam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (of Plaintiff and Defendants to Continue Trial and All Related Dates); Filed by Richard Northam (Plaintiff); Orgel (Defendant); Robert Benson Orgel, Trustee for the Saltman Family Trust Dated May 24, 1988 Erroneously Sued As Robert Benson, Trustee (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Richard Northam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge) of 03/27/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Richard Northam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Richard Northam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Richard Northam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Richard Northam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REMCO-REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ONWAEZE OGOCHUKWU VICTOR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBIAMIWE NNOGO CECILIA