This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2022 at 20:13:33 (UTC).

RICHARD NATHAN VS CHRISTIAN GARCIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 RICHARD NATHAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTIAN GARCIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7980

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATHAN RICHARD

NATHAN VALERIE LYNNE

Defendants

GARCIA CHRISTIAN

L.D. MOVING & STORAGE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABROMSON MAK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/29/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

8/10/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/28/2021: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2024
  • Hearing07/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Hearing01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • Hearing01/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Richard Nathan (Plaintiff); Valerie Lynne Nathan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Richard Nathan (Plaintiff); Valerie Lynne Nathan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Richard Nathan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Richard Nathan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Richard Nathan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Richard Nathan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less