This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 17:12:05 (UTC).

RICHARD MULLEN, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 RICHARD MULLEN filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7606

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MULLEN JENNIFER BALL

MULLEN MARSHALL

MULLEN RICHARD

MULLEN TATIANA

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLF ELLEN K. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

FLIGOR CRAIG

HUESTON JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/30/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

4/1/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/30/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

3/30/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

Answer

3/23/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • Hearing05/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Southern California Edison Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketPetition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP); Filed by Southern California Edison Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Southern California Edison Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Richard Mullen (Plaintiff); Jennifer Ball Mullen (Plaintiff); Tatiana Mullen (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Richard Mullen (Plaintiff); Jennifer Ball Mullen (Plaintiff); Tatiana Mullen (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Richard Mullen (Plaintiff); Jennifer Ball Mullen (Plaintiff); Tatiana Mullen (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLF ELLEN KAUFMAN