This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2020 at 08:32:56 (UTC).

RICHARD LANDI, ET AL. VS CITY OF LA VERNE

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 RICHARD LANDI filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF LA VERNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1722

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HARTWICK SHELLIE

LANDI RICHARD

Defendant

CITY OF LA VERNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NITTI THOMAS A

Defendant Attorney

REISMAN CARY STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

8/25/2020: Notice of Appearance

Request for Dismissal

8/26/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

6/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

Proof of Personal Service

5/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

5/19/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Petition for Writ of Mandate

5/19/2020: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

5/20/2020: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Richard Landi (Petitioner); Shellie Hartwick (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by City of La Verne (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon); Filed by Richard Landi (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Richard Landi (Petitioner); Shellie Hartwick (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Richard Landi (Petitioner); Shellie Hartwick (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Richard Landi (Petitioner); Shellie Hartwick (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Richard Landi (Petitioner); Shellie Hartwick (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LA VERNE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISMAN CARY S. ESQ.