This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 00:28:29 (UTC).

RICHARD KUEBLER, ET AL. VS TERRY SHOFRAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 RICHARD KUEBLER, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TERRY SHOFRAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARY Y. TANAKA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GARY Y. TANAKA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KUEBLER JULIE

KUEBLER RICHARD

Defendants

BRYANT RUSSEL WADE

SHOFRAN TERRY

Not Classified By Court

JOURNAL TECHNOLOGIES INC JTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STONE JASON M.

BARAJAS RAYMOND

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/3/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/11/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

7/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 09/08/2022

9/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 09/08/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by RICHARD KUEBLER, et al. on 01/03/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 09/08/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/08/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/08/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/11/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RICHARD KUEBLER (Plaintiff); JULIE KUEBLER (Plaintiff); As to: TERRY SHOFRAN (Defendant); RUSSEL WADE BRYANT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RICHARD KUEBLER (Plaintiff); JULIE KUEBLER (Plaintiff); As to: TERRY SHOFRAN (Defendant); RUSSEL WADE BRYANT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RICHARD KUEBLER (Plaintiff); JULIE KUEBLER (Plaintiff); As to: TERRY SHOFRAN (Defendant); RUSSEL WADE BRYANT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less