This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 16:55:55 (UTC).

RICHARD KLOZ VS EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 RICHARD KLOZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EAN HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3721

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KLOZ RICHARD

Defendants

EAN HOLDINGS LLC DBA ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR

KRISHNAMACHARI BHASKAR

RABENER THOMAS H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARTZ FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/13/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2024
  • Hearing09/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Richard Kloz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Richard Kloz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Richard Kloz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Richard Kloz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARTZ FREDERICK