This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 21:34:49 (UTC).

RICHARD J. BOETSCH VS A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 RICHARD J BOETSCH filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5506

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOETSCH RICHARD J.

Defendants

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

ZF ACTIVE SAFETY US INC. FKA KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY

CRANE CO.

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. FKA NISSAN MOTOR CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION WITH ITS PRINCIPAL STATE OF TENNESSEE

ROBERT BOSCH LLC FKA ROBERT BOSCH CORPORATION

VIACOMCBS INC. FKA CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER WITH CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES U.S.A. INC.

HENNESSY INDUSTRIES LLC FKA HENNESSY INDUSTRIES INC. SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AMMCO

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

CARLISLE LLC FKA CARLISLE CORPORATION SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES INC. A DIVISION OF CARLISLE CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

EATON CORPORATION

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC.

MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AND BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

FMC CORPORATION

MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORPORATION

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOEW KEVIN MATHEW

 

Court Documents

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/9/2021: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/17/2021

2/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/17/2021

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/9/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Richard J. Boetsch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Richard J. Boetsch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Richard J. Boetsch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HENNESSY INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORGWARNER CORPORATION is a litigant