This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 13:44:41 (UTC).

RICHARD HARROLD SHAFFER VS 3M COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 RICHARD HARROLD SHAFFER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6454

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAFFER RICHARD HARROLD

Defendants

3M COMPANY AKA MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. FKA ALLIED SIGNAL INC.

MCNEIL OHIO CORPORATION

COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION

EFCO INC. DBA ERIE PRESS SYSTEMS

GRANCO CLARK INC.

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY

SQUARE D COMPANY

HYSTER-YALE GROUP INC.

EATON CORPORATION

LINDBERG

THE AJAX MANUFACTURING COMPANY

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

METALCLAD INSULATION LLC

KAY CAPITAL COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES H.W. TREY

Defendant Attorneys

CALARESO CHRISTINE DIANNE

CHUNG MICHELLE

FOLLETT MATTHEW R.

GOLDBERG A. SCOTT

HUIE JEREMY D.

KUM ROBERT

SAYRE MARK DAVID

BARONIAN ROBERT H.

BAIME COLLEEN E.

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

SERRA DENISE J

LANGBORD PETER B.

LONG JAYME C

POND FRANCIS DENNIS

DEJARDIN BRADFORD JOHN

BROSAMLE ANTHONY D.

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER RULING RE: 1972 PNEUMO LETTER

4/21/2022: Order - ORDER RULING RE: 1972 PNEUMO LETTER

Ex Parte Application - APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING ARGUMENT ON PNEUMO ABEX LLC.S BERROTERAN OBJECTIONS TO PAGE LINE TRANSCRIPTS AND REOPENING FACT DISCOVERY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF TAKING

4/22/2022: Ex Parte Application - APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING ARGUMENT ON PNEUMO ABEX LLC.S BERROTERAN OBJECTIONS TO PAGE LINE TRANSCRIPTS AND REOPENING FACT DISCOVERY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF TAKING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (SHAFFER- 19STCV36454))

4/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (SHAFFER- 19STCV36454))

Trial Brief - PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING CASE OVERVIEW

4/25/2022: Trial Brief - PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING CASE OVERVIEW

Trial Brief - JOINT DEFENSE TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING SCOPE OF PHASE 1; SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF DANIEL E. TROWBRIDGE

4/25/2022: Trial Brief - JOINT DEFENSE TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING SCOPE OF PHASE 1; SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF DANIEL E. TROWBRIDGE

Notice of Settlement

4/25/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER ON APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING ARGUME...)

4/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER ON APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING ARGUME...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SARAH N. BENDON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENSE EXPERTS WHO WERE NOT TIMELY OFFERED FOR DEPOSITION AND OR FOR FAILURE TO PRODUCE DISCOVERABLE WRITINGS

4/26/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SARAH N. BENDON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENSE EXPERTS WHO WERE NOT TIMELY OFFERED FOR DEPOSITION AND OR FOR FAILURE TO PRODUCE DISCOVERABLE WRITINGS

Objection - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENSE EXPERTS WHO WERE NOT TIMELY OFFERED FOR DEPOSITION AND OR FOR FAILURE TO PRODUCE DISCOVERABLE WRITINGS

4/26/2022: Objection - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENSE EXPERTS WHO WERE NOT TIMELY OFFERED FOR DEPOSITION AND OR FOR FAILURE TO PRODUCE DISCOVERABLE WRITINGS

Order - ORDER - RULINGS ON PAGE-LINE OBJECTIONS (PAGE-LINE 16) IN LIGHT OF BERROTERAN V. SUPERIOR COURT

4/26/2022: Order - ORDER - RULINGS ON PAGE-LINE OBJECTIONS (PAGE-LINE 16) IN LIGHT OF BERROTERAN V. SUPERIOR COURT

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 EXCLUDING EVIDENCE FROM WEBSITES OF CANCER TREATMENT HOSPITALS AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING

4/27/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 EXCLUDING EVIDENCE FROM WEBSITES OF CANCER TREATMENT HOSPITALS AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING

Jury Instructions - PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS - PLAINTIFFS SPECIAL INSTRUCTION FOR PHASE 1 AND CACI 435

4/28/2022: Jury Instructions - PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS - PLAINTIFFS SPECIAL INSTRUCTION FOR PHASE 1 AND CACI 435

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (SHAFFER-19STCV36454))

4/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (SHAFFER-19STCV36454))

Objection - PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS OPENING POWERPOINT

4/29/2022: Objection - PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS OPENING POWERPOINT

Request for Dismissal

4/29/2022: Request for Dismissal

Response - DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENSE EXPERTS

4/29/2022: Response - DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENSE EXPERTS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/29/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEREMY D. HUIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENSE EXPERTS

4/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEREMY D. HUIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENSE EXPERTS

553 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • Hearing08/10/2022 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Hearing06/17/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 200 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Deposit (Richard Shaffer); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Deposit (Hyster-Yale group, Inc.); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Civil Deposit (Richard Shaffer)]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Civil Deposit (Hyster-Yale group, Inc.)]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 200; Jury Trial ((SHAFFER-19STCV36454)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketSpecial Verdict; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketJury Instructions ((GIVEN)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial (SHAFFER-19STCV36454))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
645 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by McNeil (Ohio) Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Granco Clark, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kay Capital Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Columbus McKinnon Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/17/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Richard Harrold Shaffer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Richard Harrold Shaffer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRANCO CLARK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE AJAX MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION is a litigant