This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2022 at 08:38:52 (UTC).

RICHARD HARDING VS DOMINO'S PIZZA, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 RICHARD HARDING filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOMINO'S PIZZA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2611

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARDING RICHARD

Defendants

DOMINO'S PIZZA LLC

MAR PIZZA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZELNER BARRY S

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/27/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/27/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/5/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/16/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

1/14/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by RICHARD HARDING (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by RICHARD HARDING (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RICHARD HARDING (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RICHARD HARDING (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RICHARD HARDING (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAR PIZZA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DOMINOS PIZZA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZELNER BARRY S