This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2023 at 10:49:13 (UTC).

RICHARD GUERRA VS LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 RICHARD GUERRA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6980

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUERRA RICHARD

Defendants

LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP

MESERKHANI VAHIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERLE LAWRENCE PAUL

Defendant Attorney

KAMEL BRIAN PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/12/2023: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Motion for Summary Judgment

5/12/2023: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DR. MESERKHANI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/12/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DR. MESERKHANI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF YEE LAM ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/12/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF YEE LAM ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EXPERT DR. HEWLETT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/12/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EXPERT DR. HEWLETT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Answer

4/4/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/25/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/25/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/25/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/25/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/25/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2025
  • Hearing02/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2024
  • Hearing05/29/2024 at 1:30 PM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • Hearing08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • Hearing08/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: VAHIK MESERKHANI, D.D.S. INC. dba LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP Erroneously Sued As Los Angeles Dentists Group (Defendant); Vahik Meserkhani (Defendant); As to: Richard Guerra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Expert Dr. Hewlett in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: VAHIK MESERKHANI, D.D.S. INC. dba LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP Erroneously Sued As Los Angeles Dentists Group (Defendant); Vahik Meserkhani (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Dr. Meserkhani in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: VAHIK MESERKHANI, D.D.S. INC. dba LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP Erroneously Sued As Los Angeles Dentists Group (Defendant); Vahik Meserkhani (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketSeparate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: VAHIK MESERKHANI, D.D.S. INC. dba LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP Erroneously Sued As Los Angeles Dentists Group (Defendant); Vahik Meserkhani (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Yee Lam Esq. in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: VAHIK MESERKHANI, D.D.S. INC. dba LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP Erroneously Sued As Los Angeles Dentists Group (Defendant); Vahik Meserkhani (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Richard Guerra (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles Dentists Group (Defendant); Vahik Meserkhani (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Richard Guerra (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles Dentists Group (Defendant); Vahik Meserkhani (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less