This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2022 at 12:36:09 (UTC).

RICHARD GUERRA VS LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 RICHARD GUERRA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6980

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUERRA RICHARD

Defendants

LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP

MESERKHANI VAHIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERLE LAWRENCE PAUL

Defendant Attorney

KAMEL BRIAN PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/25/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/25/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/25/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/25/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/25/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/4/2022: Answer

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2025
  • Hearing02/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • Hearing08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • Hearing08/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Richard Guerra (Plaintiff); As to: VAHIK MESERKHANI, D.D.S. INC. dba LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP Erroneously Sued As Los Angeles Dentists Group (Defendant); Service Date: 03/07/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Richard Guerra (Plaintiff); As to: Vahik Meserkhani (Defendant); Service Date: 03/07/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: VAHIK MESERKHANI, D.D.S. INC. dba LOS ANGELES DENTISTS GROUP Erroneously Sued As Los Angeles Dentists Group (Defendant); Vahik Meserkhani (Defendant); As to: Richard Guerra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Richard Guerra (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles Dentists Group (Defendant); Vahik Meserkhani (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Richard Guerra (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles Dentists Group (Defendant); Vahik Meserkhani (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Richard Guerra (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles Dentists Group (Defendant); Vahik Meserkhani (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAMEL BRIAN PATRICK