Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2021 at 19:28:06 (UTC).

RICHARD CHRISTOPHER O'BRIEN VS SUNRAY HEALTHCARE CENTER, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 RICHARD CHRISTOPHER O'BRIEN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SUNRAY HEALTHCARE CENTER, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9773

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

O'BRIEN RICHARD CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS INC.

SUNRAY HEALTHCARE CENTER INC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BRADDOCK ISAAC

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/22/2021: PI General Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/12/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/12/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2024
  • Hearing03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Hearing08/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RICHARD CHRISTOPHER O'BRIEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RICHARD CHRISTOPHER O'BRIEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RICHARD CHRISTOPHER O'BRIEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNRAY HEALTHCARE CENTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant