This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2023 at 06:25:48 (UTC).

RICHARD CHAMBERLIN VS FACEBOOK, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 RICHARD CHAMBERLIN filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against FACEBOOK, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9979

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAMBERLIN RICHARD

Defendants

COGNIZANT TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS CORP.

FACEBOOK INC.

INTERNATIONAL FACT-CHECKING NETWORK

LEAD STORIES LLC

SCIENCE FEEDBACK

THE POYNTER INSTITUTE FOR MEDIA STUDIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILBERMANN BARRY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

8/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 08/17/2023

8/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 08/17/2023

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO OSC RE DISMISSAL

8/15/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO OSC RE DISMISSAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/05/2023

6/5/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/05/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/09/2023

5/9/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/09/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;)

1/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/13/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;) OF 01/13/2023

1/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;) OF 01/13/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

1/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 01/10/2023

1/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 01/10/2023

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/28/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

12/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/28/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2024
  • Hearing01/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 08/17/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 updated: Result Date to 08/17/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketOpposition to OSC Re Dismissal; Filed by: Richard Chamberlin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/05/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/17/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): As To Parties: Richard Chamberlin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Richard Chamberlin (Plaintiff); As to: Facebook, Inc. (Defendant); The Poynter Institute for Media Studies, Inc. (Defendant); International Fact-Checking Network (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Richard Chamberlin (Plaintiff); As to: Facebook, Inc. (Defendant); The Poynter Institute for Media Studies, Inc. (Defendant); International Fact-Checking Network (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); TP by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less