This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 01:28:43 (UTC).

RICHARD CASTANON VS NATALIA RAVAH ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 RICHARD CASTANON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATALIA RAVAH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7222

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CASTANON RICHARD

Defendants and Respondents

HASSAN DEANNA AMJAD

HASSAN NADIA M.

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

ASMA OMAR

HASSAN AMJAD

RAVAH NATALIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GEOULLA DANIEL D. ESQ.

GEOULLA DANIEL DANNY ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MADIGAN MICHAEL V.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/22/2017: Complaint

Summons

12/22/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

CoverSheet

12/22/2017: CoverSheet

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/21/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Unknown

4/26/2019: Unknown

Answer

12/12/2018: Answer

Answer

11/2/2018: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Richard Castanon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Richard Castanon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nadia M. Hassan (Defendant); Amjad Hassan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Deanna Amjad Hassan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Richard Castanon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Richard Castanon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7222    Hearing Date: January 03, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

RICHARD CASTANON,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

DEANNA HASSAN, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: ****7222

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Dept. 3

10:00 a.m.

January 3, 2020

Plaintiff, Richard Castanon filed this action against Defendants, Deanna Hassan, et al. for damages arising out of an automobile accident. Plaintiff filed the action on 12/22/17. Trial was originally scheduled for 6/24/19. On 5/21/19, the Court granted the parties’ stipulation to continue the trial, and on 11/25/19, the Court granted an ex parte application to continue the trial. Trial is currently scheduled for 2/04/20.

As an initial note, the FSC in this case is scheduled at 10:00 a.m. on 1/03/20, and the hearing on this motion is scheduled at 1:30 p.m. on 1/30/20. The Court will hear this motion to continue trial at 10:00 a.m., in connection with the scheduled FSC.

At this time, Plaintiff moves to continue the trial date for approximately four months, contending (a) Plaintiff’s attorney abruptly left the firm, and a new attorney has only recently substituted in, and (b) Plaintiff’s lead attorney is engaged in trial on the date currently scheduled for the FSC, and has back-to-back trials scheduled until May of 2020. Notably, all parties stipulate to the requested continuance.

The Court finds Plaintiff’s attorney’s recent change in assignment constitutes good cause for a continuance of the trial date. In the absence of opposition (indeed, as noted above, all parties have expressly stipulated to the relief sought), the motion to continue trial is granted.

The 2/04/20 trial date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Friday, 5/29/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse. The 1/03/20 FSC is continued to 5/15/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3. Per the parties’ agreement, the discovery cut-off date is NOT continued as a result of this trial continuance. The parties’ agreement is silent concerning expert designations and discovery; Counsel are ordered to meet and confer forthwith to determine whether or not expert designation and discovery cut-off dates are continued as a result of this trial continuance, and they must put their agreement in writing.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MADIGAN MICHAEL VINCENT