This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2022 at 17:20:29 (UTC).

RICE, JOHN VS RICE, ALEJANDRA

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 RICE, JOHN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RICE, ALEJANDRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is POWELL, MICHAEL R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3327

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

POWELL, MICHAEL R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RICE JOHN

Respondent

RICE ALEJANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SPERLING MITCHELL

Respondent Attorney

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

5/23/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Notice - Unavailability of Counsel - Notice - Unavailability of Counsel (Notices)

6/6/2022: Notice - Unavailability of Counsel - Notice - Unavailability of Counsel (Notices)

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

6/10/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

6/10/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense (Declarations)

6/10/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense (Declarations)

Notice - Notice (Comment)

6/10/2022: Notice - Notice (Comment)

Notice - Change of Address - Notice - Change of Address (Notices)

6/21/2022: Notice - Change of Address - Notice - Change of Address (Notices)

FCS-Mediation Memo

6/21/2022: FCS-Mediation Memo

Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration (Declarations)

6/23/2022: Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration (Declarations)

Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense (Declarations)

6/23/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense (Declarations)

Minute Order

7/7/2022: Minute Order

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations)

5/2/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses)

5/2/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses)

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/3/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child Support - RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child Support - $60.00 (Comment)

4/20/2022: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child Support - RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child Support - $60.00 (Comment)

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

4/20/2022: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

4/6/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment)

3/28/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • Hearing10/05/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department 22 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; RFO - Custody, Visitation, Child Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 22, Powell, Michael R., Presiding; RFO - Custody, Visitation, Child Support - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDissomaster Printout

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (Declaration - Income and Expense (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketResponsive Declaration (Responsive Declaration (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketNotice - Change of Address (Notice - Change of Address (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation (Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child Support (RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child Support - $60.00 (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - $435.00 (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons (Summons) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less