This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 02:14:46 (UTC).

RICE, EMILY JANE VS GORTON, JOHN ALLAN

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 RICE, EMILY JANE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GORTON, JOHN ALLAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6703

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RICE EMILY JANE

Respondent

GORTON JOHN ALLAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

STERNBERG CAROL

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

Respondent Attorney

YOUNGMAN LAUREN OLIVIA

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/17/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

6/17/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

6/14/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/14/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

6/14/2021: Summons

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

7/21/2021: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Proof of Service of Summons

7/21/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - of Watts Claim

8/10/2021: Notice - of Watts Claim

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

8/9/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

8/5/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service - Mail

8/5/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

10/29/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

10/28/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Watts Claim ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROL