This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/25/2023 at 00:31:06 (UTC).

RICARDO SOTO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CARLOS ALBERTO RAMIREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 RICARDO SOTO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARLOS ALBERTO RAMIREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0654

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOTO AN INDIVIDUAL RICARDO

Defendants

RAMIREZ AN INDIVIDUAL CARLOS ALBERTO

STONE BREWING CO. LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRISMER MARC

Defendant Attorney

LIVINGSTON RENEE WELZE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/24/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/26/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/17/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Carlos Alberto Ramirez, an individual (Defendant); Stone Brewing Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Ricardo Soto, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 12/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ricardo Soto, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Stone Brewing Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/30/2022; Service Cost: 101.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ricardo Soto, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Alberto Ramirez, an individual (Defendant); Service Date: 11/23/2022; Service Cost: 102.05; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark C. Kim in Department S27 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ricardo Soto, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Alberto Ramirez, an individual (Defendant); Stone Brewing Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ricardo Soto, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Alberto Ramirez, an individual (Defendant); Stone Brewing Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ricardo Soto, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Alberto Ramirez, an individual (Defendant); Stone Brewing Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less