This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 23:00:29 (UTC).

RICARDO SAID ORTEGA LIMON VS GEORGE WILLIAMS, JR

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 RICARDO SAID ORTEGA LIMON filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against GEORGE WILLIAMS, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8806

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTEGA LIMON RICARDO SAID

Defendant

WILLIAMS GEORGE JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES AYINDE A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/5/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/5/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by RICARDO SAID ORTEGA LIMON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RICARDO SAID ORTEGA LIMON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RICARDO SAID ORTEGA LIMON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RICARDO SAID ORTEGA LIMON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RICARDO SAID ORTEGA LIMON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES AYINDE A