This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 19:37:06 (UTC).

RICARDO RENTERIA VS UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 RICARDO RENTERIA filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0688

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENTERIA RICARDO

Defendants

BIG SAVER FOODS

UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASOBIE UGO O

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/24/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/24/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/24/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/24/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RICARDO RENTERIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RICARDO RENTERIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RICARDO RENTERIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RICARDO RENTERIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIG SAVER FOODS is a litigant

Latest cases where UKA'S BIG SAVER FOODS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASOBIE UGO O.