This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2023 at 15:17:53 (UTC).

RICARDO MALDONADO JIMENEZ VS JONS INTERNATIONAL MARKETPLACE

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 RICARDO MALDONADO JIMENEZ filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against JONS INTERNATIONAL MARKETPLACE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9554

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALDONADO JIMENEZ RICARDO

Defendant

JONS INTERNATIONAL MARKETPLACE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/21/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

12/21/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

12/21/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/21/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/21/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/3/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2024
  • Hearing12/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2024
  • Hearing06/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2024
  • Hearing06/05/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ricardo Maldonado Jimenez (Plaintiff); As to: Jons International Marketplace (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/28/2022; Service Cost: 41.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ricardo Maldonado Jimenez (Plaintiff); As to: Jons International Marketplace (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ricardo Maldonado Jimenez (Plaintiff); As to: Jons International Marketplace (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ricardo Maldonado Jimenez (Plaintiff); As to: Jons International Marketplace (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/05/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less