This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 22:52:25 (UTC).

RICARDO JUAREZ VS VALLARTA SUPERMARKETS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 RICARDO JUAREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VALLARTA SUPERMARKETS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN, SERENA R. MURILLO and MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2968

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

SERENA R. MURILLO

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAREZ RICARDO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOE SECURITY GUARD COMPANY

VALLARTA SUPERMARKETS

DOE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY

GLOBAL ALVTOR SECURITY ENTERPRISES INC.

5905 NILES STREET LLC DOE PROPERTY OWNER #4

DOE PROPERTY OWNER 1

HIGHPOINT CAPITAL GROUP LLC DOE 6

PALM-GATEWAY SC LLC DOE 5

VALLARTA PROPERTIES LLC DOE PROPERTY OWNER #3

VALLARTA SUPERMARKETS SHOPPING CENTER LLC. DOE PROPERTY #2

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

HIGHPOINT CAPITAL GROUP LLC DOE 6

PALM-GATEWAY SC LLC DOE 5

Cross Defendant

SHIELDS KEVIN NICHOLAS

Not Classified By Court

VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. ADM. BY SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAGHER NICHOLAS F ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DUNBAR KEVIN TERRENCE ESQ.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MARSILIO JEFFREY SCOTT ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/7/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS (BY DEFENDANT HIG...)

2/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS (BY DEFENDANT HIG...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS (BY DEFENDANT HIG...)

2/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS (BY DEFENDANT HIG...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

2/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 02/08/2022

2/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 02/08/2022

Notice of Ruling

2/8/2022: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

2/10/2022: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING...) OF 02/10/2022

2/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING...) OF 02/10/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING...)

2/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING...)

Order - Dismissal

2/10/2022: Order - Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

2/14/2022: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

2/14/2022: Notice of Ruling

Motion re: - MOTION RE: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

2/3/2022: Motion re: - MOTION RE: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Notice - MOTION RE: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

2/3/2022: Notice - MOTION RE: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Supplemental Brief - BRIEF COURT ORDERED BRIEFING ON LESSER SANCTION RE MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTION

1/25/2022: Supplemental Brief - BRIEF COURT ORDERED BRIEFING ON LESSER SANCTION RE MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTION

Supplemental Brief - BRIEF COURT ORDERED BRIEFING ON LESSER SANCTION RE MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTION

1/25/2022: Supplemental Brief - BRIEF COURT ORDERED BRIEFING ON LESSER SANCTION RE MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTION

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/28/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Highpoint Capital Group LLC (Doe 6) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Highpoint Capital Group LLC (Doe 6) (Cross-Complainant); Palm-Gateway SC LLC (Doe 5) (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Palm-Gateway SC LLC (Doe 5) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Unserved Defendants Should Not Be Dismissed) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions ((by Defendant Palm-Gateway SC, LLC.)for Plaintiff's Willful Failure to Comply with this Court's Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Discovery) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions ((by Defendant Highpoint Capital, LLC.) for Plaintiff's Willful Failure to Comply with this Court's Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Discovery) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by RICARDO JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Terminating...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, TRIAL, & ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING); Filed by RICARDO JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by RICARDO JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RICARDO JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by RICARDO JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RICARDO JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RICARDO JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RICARDO JUAREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: *******2968 Hearing Date: August 12, 2021 Dept: 1

Motion by Defendant Palm-Gateway SC to transfer to North District.

Granted. No opposition filed. Personal injury in question occurred in North District. Erroneously filed in Central. '


b'

Case Number: *******2968 Hearing Date: July 13, 2021 Dept: 29

TENTATIVE

The Court grants Defendant’s motion to transfer.

This action is transferred to the North District at the Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse.

Defendant is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Background

This is a personal injury action arising out of Plaintiff Ricardo Juarez (“Plaintiff”) getting attacked by a man attempting to steal merchandise from tenants at a mall.

On June 17, 2021, Plaintiff filed his complaint against several defendants and doe defendants, some of which Plaintiff later substituted with parties. Plaintiff later dismissed his claims against some defendants.

Relevant for the purposes of this motion, Plaintiff substituted Defendant Palm-Gateway SC, LLC (“Defendant”) for Doe 5[1] on November 11, 2020.

On May 6, 2021, Defendant filed the instant motion seeking to transfer this case from the Central District (Spring Street Courthouse) to the North District (Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse).

There is no filed opposition.

Legal Standard

The Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles Local Court rule 2.3(a)(1)(A) provides in pertinent part

Mandatory Filing: Every unlimited civil tort action for bodily injury, wrongful death, or damage to personal property (hereinafter referred to as “Personal Injury Action”) must be filed in the Central District at the Stanley Mosk Courthouse, or in the North District at the Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse. The filing court locator on the Los Angeles Superior Court website (www.lacourt.org) should be used to determine the appropriate filing location.

In addition, a motion to transfer a personal injury action from one district to another, including motions based upon a failure to file the case in accordance with the requirements set forth by this rule, “shall be determined in the Central District or in the North District in one of the departments designated to hear those matters (‘Personal Injury Court’).” (Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles Local Court rule 2.3(b)(2).)

Discussion

Defendant contends that because the instant action for bodily injuries arises from actions

at 1803 E. Palmdale Drive, Palmdale, California 93550, it is mandatory that this case have been filed in the North District. The Court agrees. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.3(a)(1)(A), this action should have been filed in the North District.

Plaintiff does not oppose this request.

The Court grants Defendant’s motion to transfer the action.

Conclusion

The Court grants Defendant’s motion to transfer.

This action is transferred to the North District at the Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse.

Defendant is ordered to give notice of this ruling.


[1] Defendant claims that Plaintiff named it as Doe 1, but the amendment to complaint identifies the entity as Doe 5.

'


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBAL ALVTOR SECURITY ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLARTA SUPERMARKETS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARSILIO JEFFREY S. ESQ.