Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 08:01:06 (UTC).

RICARDO ELIAS VS EAN HOLDINGS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 RICARDO ELIAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EAN HOLDINGS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1338

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIAS RICARDO

Defendants

CASILLAS GOMEZ NORBERTO CARLOS

EAN HOLDINGS LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

RAPID PASADENA SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIRIAN JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/18/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2024
  • Hearing06/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • Hearing11/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ricardo Elias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ricardo Elias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ricardo Elias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAPID PASADENA SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant