Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 00:59:04 (UTC).

RICARDO DE LA CRUZ VS FABIAN LOMELI GOMEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 RICARDO DE LA CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FABIAN LOMELI GOMEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7783

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LA CRUZ RICARDO

Defendants

GOMEZ FABIAN LOMELI

MILFELDS' NURSEY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY HOWARD ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

HONEY ANNE M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2023
  • Hearing12/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Hearing06/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Hearing05/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Fabian Lomeli Gomez (Defendant); Milfelds' Nursey Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Fabian Lomeli Gomez (Defendant); Milfelds' Nursey Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ricardo De La Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ricardo De La Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ricardo De La Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ricardo De La Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ricardo De La Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY HOWARD ALLEN ESQ.