Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 04:43:38 (UTC).

RICARDO CARDONA VS RAYMOND DE RIQUEZ, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 RICARDO CARDONA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAYMOND DE RIQUEZ, JR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7808

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARDONA RICARDO

Defendants

JOE'S SWEEPING INC.

DE RIQUEZ RAYMOND JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL TIMOTHY PAUL

Defendant Attorney

METZGER MORGAN A

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/28/2021: Answer

Answer

6/28/2021: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/23/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

6/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

6/2/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2024
  • Hearing05/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • Hearing11/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • Hearing10/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Joe's Sweeping, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Raymond De Riquez, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Ricardo Cardona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Ricardo Cardona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ricardo Cardona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ricardo Cardona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ricardo Cardona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ricardo Cardona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ricardo Cardona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ricardo Cardona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOE'S SWEEPING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL TIMOTHY PAUL