This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2022 at 03:30:39 (UTC).

RICARDO ANAYA VAZQUEZ VS SBB ROOFING INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 RICARDO ANAYA VAZQUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SBB ROOFING INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0620

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANAYA VAZQUEZ RICARDO

Defendants

DIAZ LUPE

SBB ROOFING INC. AKA BILT-WELL ROOF AND MATERIAL CO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHELLY THOMAS HENRY

Defendant Attorney

WARDEN JENNA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

6/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Settlement

6/28/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2021

6/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2021

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL

7/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL

Request for Dismissal

9/24/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF EARLY MEDIATION

3/30/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF EARLY MEDIATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)

3/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT)

Answer

3/5/2021: Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/9/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE FILING OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPTS

11/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE FILING OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPTS

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

11/19/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/12/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/1/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/6/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ricardo Anaya Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL); Filed by Ricardo Anaya Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docketat 11:14 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Ricardo Anaya Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ricardo Anaya Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ricardo Anaya Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ricardo Anaya Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ricardo Anaya Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ricardo Anaya Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ricardo Anaya Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ricardo Anaya Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SBB ROOFING INC. AKA BILT WELL ROOF AND MATERIAL CO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHELLY THOMAS H.