This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2023 at 12:00:15 (UTC).

RICA ELBAZ, ET AL. VS INFINITI OF VAN NUYS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 RICA ELBAZ, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INFINITI OF VAN NUYS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are COLIN P. LEIS and ELIA WEINBACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2958

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

COLIN P. LEIS

ELIA WEINBACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELBAZ RICA

ELBAZ YIZHAQ

Defendants

INFINITI OF VAN NUYS

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA

Defendant Attorney

SWEENEY MICHAEL P.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

12/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Notice of Ruling

4/5/2023: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

3/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/18/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/18/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE (DATES REMAIN)

1/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE (DATES REMAIN)

Case Management Statement

1/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/10/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/3/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

12/16/2022: Answer

Answer

11/21/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/24/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/13/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2024
  • Hearing05/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2024
  • Hearing04/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2024
  • Hearing01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (3-5 Day Estimate) scheduled for 05/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Regarding Mediation and Discovery scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Rica Elbaz (Plaintiff); Yizhaq Elbaz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Michael P. Sweeney (Attorney): Middle Name changed from P to P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketAddress for Michael P. Sweeney (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant), NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., (Defendant) to NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., (Defendant), INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketAddress for Tionna Dolin (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RICA ELBAZ (Plaintiff); YIZHAQ ELBAZ (Plaintiff); As to: INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RICA ELBAZ (Plaintiff); YIZHAQ ELBAZ (Plaintiff); As to: INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RICA ELBAZ (Plaintiff); YIZHAQ ELBAZ (Plaintiff); As to: INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michelle Williams Court in Department 74 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less