This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2023 at 12:27:50 (UTC).

RICA ELBAZ, ET AL. VS INFINITI OF VAN NUYS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 RICA ELBAZ, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INFINITI OF VAN NUYS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIA WEINBACH and COLIN P. LEIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2958

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIA WEINBACH

COLIN P. LEIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELBAZ RICA

ELBAZ YIZHAQ

Defendants

INFINITI OF VAN NUYS

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA

Defendant Attorney

SWEENEY MICHAEL P

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

12/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Case Management Statement

1/18/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/18/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE (DATES REMAIN)

1/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE (DATES REMAIN)

Case Management Statement

1/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/10/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/3/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

12/16/2022: Answer

Answer

11/21/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/24/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/13/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • Hearing04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/05/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: RICA ELBAZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: RICA ELBAZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketNotice OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE (Dates Remain); Filed by: RICA ELBAZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketNotice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: RICA ELBAZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 74 - Hon. Colin P. Leiseffective 01/09/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant), NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., (Defendant) to NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., (Defendant), INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketAddress for Tionna Dolin (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: RICA ELBAZ (Plaintiff); YIZHAQ ELBAZ (Plaintiff); As to: INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RICA ELBAZ (Plaintiff); YIZHAQ ELBAZ (Plaintiff); As to: INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RICA ELBAZ (Plaintiff); YIZHAQ ELBAZ (Plaintiff); As to: INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant); NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michelle Williams Court in Department 74 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less