This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 03:36:13 (UTC).

RIA I. CANLAS, ET AL. VS LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 RIA I CANLAS filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6893

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Interpleaders

CANLAS RIA I.

FISHER WILLIAM C.

KESHISHI MARITA

YAGHMAEE SOHEIL

ESHBAUGH CHARLES

MARSHALL HARRY N.

SANEI FRIEDA

MOULDEN JENNIFER N.

KOPER BARRY RICHARDS

HARUTYUNYAN ROBERT

HARUTYUNYAN MICHAEL

DONELL JOHN

MADRID SCOTT

SCRIVNER STEVEN

GABRIEL GREGORY

KESHISHIAN PIERRE

Defendants

LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Interpleader Attorneys

BECKER TODD BENJAMIN

BRIDGFORD RICHARD KEVIN

MCNICHOLAS JOHN IV

MCNICHOLAS JOHN PATRICK IV

Defendant Attorney

SMITH KEVIN D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

7/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

6/28/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/1/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/1/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

6/11/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/10/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/10/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/10/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3/10/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

12/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

Complaint

12/8/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • Hearing09/27/2021 at 4:00 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketat 4:32 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court) of 07/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ria I. Canlas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ria I. Canlas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ria I. Canlas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Pierre Keshishian (Plaintiff); Ava Keshishian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Rielle Chloe Canlas (Plaintiff); Roel N. Canlas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Jennifer N. Moulden (Plaintiff); Kaylee Noelle Moulden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Chase Andrew Moulden (Plaintiff); Jennifer N. Moulden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 2:47 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Errata); Filed by Rielle Chloe Canlas (Plaintiff); Roel N. Canlas (Plaintiff); Gregory Gabriel (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ria I. Canlas (Plaintiff); Rielle Chloe Canlas (Plaintiff); Roel N. Canlas (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ria I. Canlas (Plaintiff); Rielle Chloe Canlas (Plaintiff); Roel N. Canlas (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH KEVIN D